U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05009
  • Case Name: Stanko v. Big D Oil Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • April 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 13, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 22, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • March 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 22, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Summons Reissued]
  • February 16, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 25, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • January 25, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 25, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 25, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 25, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.