U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. West
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 23, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 17, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 03, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 27, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 22, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 15, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 19, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 19, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 12, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 12, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 22, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 22, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 03, 2017: [Discovery]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [Response]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 31, 2017: [Request]
  • January 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2017: [Arrest]
  • January 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.