U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-01001
  • Case Name: Allred v. Engel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Exhibits Destroyed]
  • October 05, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • October 05, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • September 19, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • September 19, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 14, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • September 13, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • August 17, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
  • April 18, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Interrogatory Answers]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Production of Documents]
  • March 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Interrogatories]
  • March 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • March 22, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • February 27, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • January 30, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • January 30, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 30, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summons Issued]
  • January 30, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • January 28, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • January 28, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.