U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lytle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Response]
  • December 09, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • November 10, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
  • November 07, 2022: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 16, 2022: [Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Proposed Order]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Answer of Garnishee]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Certificate]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
  • January 07, 2022: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • December 01, 2021: [Certificate]
  • December 01, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
  • October 01, 2021: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
  • January 20, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 13, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 12, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice]
  • December 16, 2020: [Response]
  • December 02, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Reduce Sentence]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 11, 2020: [Response]
  • June 11, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 10, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 02, 2020: [Extend]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 14, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 27, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 27, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 24, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 24, 2020: [Response]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 17, 2020: [Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 14, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 14, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • April 14, 2020: [Release from Custody]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
  • March 06, 2020: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
  • February 19, 2020: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
  • January 16, 2020: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 15, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 15, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 23, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 11, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 18, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Reply]
  • January 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Reduce Sentence]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • November 29, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 21, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • November 21, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 08, 2018: [Transcript]
  • November 06, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 02, 2018: [Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 17, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 12, 2018: [Passport - Return of]
  • October 12, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • October 05, 2018: [Objection]
  • October 05, 2018: [Restitution Related Document (attorney use)]
  • October 05, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 05, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 02, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 01, 2018: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 24, 2018: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • September 21, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Response]
  • September 20, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 19, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 18, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 17, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 16, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 13, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 13, 2018: [Vacate (Not 28:2255)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Response]
  • September 12, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 12, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 11, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 11, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 10, 2018: [Brief]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • September 10, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 10, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 07, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 07, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 30, 2018: [Supplement]
  • August 29, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 17, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 17, 2018: [Response]
  • July 17, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order]
  • July 11, 2018: [Witness List]
  • July 11, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 11, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 10, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 10, 2018: [Restitution Related Document (attorney use)]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 28, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • May 22, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 17, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • May 16, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 10, 2018: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 26, 2018: [Extend]
  • April 26, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 26, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • April 25, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 25, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 25, 2018: [Ex Parte Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 21, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 20, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 19, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 19, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 13, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • April 13, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 13, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 11, 2018: [Response]
  • April 10, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2018: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 10, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 06, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2018: [Letter]
  • March 29, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 28, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 26, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 14, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • January 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 26, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 26, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 26, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 24, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 24, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • January 18, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 18, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 10, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 08, 2018: [Reply]
  • January 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 02, 2018: [Response]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 29, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 29, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2017: [Leave to]
  • December 18, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 18, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • December 18, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 14, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 14, 2017: [In Limine]
  • December 14, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Protective Order ]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • December 04, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Response]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • November 29, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 03, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 02, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice]
  • September 13, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Joinder]
  • May 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 28, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 05, 2017: [Response]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2017: [Response]
  • April 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Joinder]
  • March 28, 2017: [Response]
  • March 28, 2017: [Joinder]
  • March 24, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • March 20, 2017: [Joinder]
  • March 17, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 15, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2017: [Response]
  • March 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 23, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [Joinder]
  • February 22, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 16, 2017: [Response]
  • February 15, 2017: [Discovery]
  • February 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 07, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 06, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2017: [Request]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 30, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 30, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 30, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 30, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • January 30, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 30, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.