U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Orrock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer of Garnishee]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 14, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Response]
  • April 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Case Reopened]
  • October 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 26, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 25, 2017: [Reply]
  • September 22, 2017: [Response]
  • September 19, 2017: [Objection]
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 31, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 25, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 25, 2017: [Witness List]
  • August 23, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 18, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 16, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • July 31, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2017: [Arrest]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 10, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 10, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 10, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 10, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 03, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • January 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 30, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.