U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thunder Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 05, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 29, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 29, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 29, 2017: [Evaluation]
  • December 28, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 28, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 12, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Waiver]
  • July 07, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 30, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 21, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 11, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 05, 2017: [Suppress]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 10, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 08, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • February 07, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Request]
  • February 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 30, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 30, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.