U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-30100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Turning Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
  • February 02, 2017: [Response]
  • February 01, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 30, 2017: [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.