U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04007
  • Case Name: Kane v. Reisch et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • August 14, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 03, 2017: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • July 03, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 01, 2017: [Letter Received]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Supplement]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • February 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • January 31, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • January 31, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 31, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 31, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 31, 2017: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.