U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05041
  • Case Name: Knight v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Transcript of Social Security Admin Hrg Received]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
May, 2018
  • May 20, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 15, 2018: [Objection]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 07, 2017: [Brief]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 30, 2017: [Reverse]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.