U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-01002
  • Case Name: SDIF Limited Partnership 2 v. Tentexkota, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 19, 2019: [Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 24, 2019: [Stay]
  • May 23, 2019: [Stay]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
  • December 19, 2018: [Receipt]
  • December 13, 2018: [Letter]
  • December 11, 2018: [Letter]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Joinder]
  • November 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Response]
  • October 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 22, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 22, 2018: [Reply]
  • October 22, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 12, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 11, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 10, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Brief]
  • October 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 10, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 09, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
  • October 09, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 08, 2018: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 19, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • September 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 19, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 14, 2018: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2018: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • August 13, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 08, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 24, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 24, 2018: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • July 24, 2018: [Third Party Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 24, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • July 24, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
  • July 24, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • July 23, 2018: [Third Party Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • July 23, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 18, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 16, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 13, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 11, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 10, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 09, 2018: [Joinder]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2018: [Joinder]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 25, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 19, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 19, 2018: [Reply]
  • June 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 13, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 11, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 11, 2018: [Brief]
  • June 11, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 05, 2018: [Compel]
  • June 05, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • June 01, 2018: [Letter]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Letter]
  • May 22, 2018: [Letter]
  • May 15, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
  • May 14, 2018: [Letter]
  • May 04, 2018: [Letter]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 23, 2018: [Letter]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Letter]
  • March 27, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
  • March 12, 2018: [Letter]
  • March 09, 2018: [Letter]
  • March 08, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • January 29, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 29, 2018: [Brief]
  • January 17, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 15, 2018: [Return of Service]
  • January 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 11, 2018: [Return of Service]
  • January 10, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 10, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 10, 2018: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • January 09, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 20, 2017: [Third Party Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 20, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • December 20, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 11, 2017: [Return of Service]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Reply]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 06, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [Leave to]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Form 52 Report]
  • October 02, 2017: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2017: [Letter]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Letter]
  • June 14, 2017: [Response]
  • June 14, 2017: [Brief]
  • June 05, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Reply]
  • April 24, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 07, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2017: [Response]
  • April 04, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 23, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2017: [Leave to]
  • March 17, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 17, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 17, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2017: [Third Party Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 01, 2017: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order of Transfer - Other Division]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • February 01, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.