U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05010
  • Case Name: Anderson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Reply]
  • June 17, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 03, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 03, 2019: [Response]
  • June 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 15, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 14, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2019: [Response]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Supplement]
  • April 29, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2019: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 10, 2019: [Certificate]
  • April 10, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: [Quash]
  • April 04, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 21, 2019: [Response]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Certificate]
  • February 28, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 28, 2019: [Compel]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 13, 2018: [Dismiss Party]
  • December 11, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 10, 2018: [Dismiss Party]
  • December 10, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice]
  • November 20, 2018: [Appendix]
  • November 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 20, 2018: [Compel]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 23, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 16, 2018: [Reply]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 02, 2018: [Objection]
  • October 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Withdraw]
  • September 11, 2018: [Appendix]
  • September 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 11, 2018: [Exclude]
  • September 11, 2018: [Stay]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Designation of Expert Witness]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Reply]
  • May 08, 2018: [Objection]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • December 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 07, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 06, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Leave to]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Discovery Report]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 05, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Certificate]
  • April 21, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 01, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 06, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 03, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 02, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 02, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 02, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 02, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.