U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-40098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stefanyuk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 29, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 15, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 17, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 06, 2018: [Transcript]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 28, 2018: [Continue]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 19, 2017: [Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 10, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 08, 2017: [Continue]
  • June 06, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 06, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 24, 2017: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • February 24, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 23, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • February 22, 2017: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Request for Warrant]
  • February 09, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.