U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-10053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramsey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 08, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 31, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 31, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 31, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2020: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • January 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 22, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 14, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 16, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 10, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 09, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 11, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 11, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.