U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Warrior
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 29, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 15, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 22, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 13, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 07, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 13, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 04, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 06, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 06, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 06, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.