U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30002
  • Case Name: Lori Juliana Eschen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
April, 2017
  • April 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • March 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • March 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • March 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • March 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.