U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lundy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Passport - Return of]
  • May 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 19, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 11, 2017: [Extend]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 15, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 14, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 14, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 10, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 07, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 07, 2017: [Information - Felony]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.