U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 04-10253
  • Case Name: Michael Stewart Fitz and Carol Jean Fitz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Eligibility for Discharge (Ch 13)]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver)(fee required)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.