U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Contreras-Castillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 15, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 03, 2017: [Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • February 08, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.