U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fortin-Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 14, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • February 08, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.