U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 23, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 13, 2018: [Forfeiture]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 20, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • May 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 14, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 26, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 08, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Request]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 14, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.