U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Odie et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 24, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 11, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Response]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 24, 2020: [Response]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice]
  • November 10, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 04, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • November 03, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • November 02, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 11, 2020: [Supplement]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 09, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 09, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 08, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 07, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 03, 2020: [Extend]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 22, 2020: [Supplement]
  • May 20, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 13, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 11, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 21, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 09, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 09, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 04, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 16, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 12, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
December, 2017
  • December 30, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 28, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 28, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 27, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 18, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 18, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 15, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 23, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 12, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 05, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 04, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 04, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • October 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 26, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 26, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2017: [Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 24, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 24, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 14, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 14, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2017: [Response]
  • May 16, 2017: [Discovery]
  • May 12, 2017: [Request]
  • May 10, 2017: [Request]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 09, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 08, 2017: [Request]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 05, 2017: [Discovery]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 13, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Discovery]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 08, 2017: [Discovery]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 06, 2017: [Response]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Request]
  • February 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 22, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 21, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 15, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 14, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.