U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 09, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 02, 2020: [Supplement]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Extend]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 09, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 07, 2018: [Transcript]
  • February 06, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • January 23, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 23, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 23, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 05, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 03, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • January 03, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 21, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 20, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2017: [Expedite ]
  • December 14, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 13, 2017: [Extend]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • September 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 28, 2017: [Verdict]
  • September 28, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • September 28, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 28, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 28, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 28, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • September 27, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 27, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 26, 2017: [Jury List]
  • September 25, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 22, 2017: [Response]
  • September 22, 2017: [Remark]
  • September 21, 2017: [Brief]
  • September 21, 2017: [Response]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 19, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 19, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 19, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice]
  • September 18, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 12, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 20, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2017: [Response]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 03, 2017: [Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Request]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 22, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 14, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.