U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graves
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 07, 2017: [Rule 20 - Transfer Out]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 27, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 10, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • February 07, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.