U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jaime
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 09, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 11, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 02, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 19, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 19, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 19, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 06, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Request]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 22, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • February 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 13, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 08, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.