U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-40074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Winkleman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 06, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 27, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 15, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 09, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 09, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.