U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kent
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 17, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 26, 2021: [Transcript]
  • April 23, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 21, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 20, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 19, 2021: [Hearing]
  • April 15, 2021: [Transcript]
  • April 06, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 02, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 27, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2019: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • June 25, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (deactivated)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 21, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 12, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 31, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 27, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 05, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • September 06, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 05, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 29, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 16, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 15, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 10, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Consent]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 26, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 21, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 02, 2017: [Discovery]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 17, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2017: [Request]
  • February 16, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 14, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 09, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 08, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.