U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rainbow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 30, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Evaluation]
  • October 23, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • August 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 01, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 30, 2017: [Discovery]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2017: [Response]
  • February 15, 2017: [Request]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 09, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.