U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dupris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 19, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 09, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 09, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • July 05, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 05, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 02, 2018: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 02, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 18, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 17, 2017: [Furlough]
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 02, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 26, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 25, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 20, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Warrant]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 22, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • June 21, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 12, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • June 12, 2017: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Request for Warrant]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 13, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.