U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-30093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Denoyer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 08, 2022: [Consent]
  • February 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 16, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 03, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 16, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 05, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 30, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 24, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 21, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 20, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 05, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 06, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.