U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harmon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 06, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 24, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 20, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 03, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • September 11, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 11, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 07, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 30, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice]
  • August 29, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 24, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 24, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 06, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 25, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 17, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 25, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 23, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 23, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 11, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 10, 2018: [Request]
  • January 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2018: [Request]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.