U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chasing In Timber
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 09, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 18, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • December 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 15, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 17, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 01, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 14, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 04, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 11, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 08, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 19, 2017: [Furlough]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [Request]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 23, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 22, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Request]
  • February 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 17, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.