U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dolezal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 08, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 08, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 12, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 08, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 14, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Information - Felony]
  • April 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 24, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 24, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 24, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 24, 2017: [Request]
  • February 24, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.