U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lunderman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 22, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 20, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 06, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • October 06, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 05, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 10, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 10, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 08, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 01, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Request]
  • April 06, 2017: [Request]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Request]
  • March 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.