U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 07, 2018: [Witness List]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 13, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 09, 2018: [Transcript]
  • February 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 07, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 02, 2018: [Transcript]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 30, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 30, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 30, 2017: [Verdict]
  • November 29, 2017: [Response to Jury Question]
  • November 29, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • November 29, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 29, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 28, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 28, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 28, 2017: [Jury List]
  • November 27, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 22, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 22, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 22, 2017: [Witness List]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 20, 2017: [Witness List]
  • November 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 20, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 14, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 13, 2017: [Brief]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 17, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 03, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 29, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 08, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 07, 2017: [Witness List]
  • September 05, 2017: [Response]
  • September 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 25, 2017: [Suppress]
  • August 24, 2017: [Extend]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 24, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 21, 2017: [Request]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2017: [Request]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 20, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 14, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.