U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Tomahawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 22, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 21, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 18, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 21, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 02, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 13, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 15, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 15, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Request]
  • March 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.