U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oka
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 16, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 10, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 28, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 28, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 28, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 28, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 10, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 22, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 01, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 21, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 28, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • June 23, 2017: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 05, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 05, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 27, 2017: [Request]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 23, 2017: [Request]
  • February 23, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 15, 2017: [Redacted Indictment / Superseding Indictment for Service]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.