U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • December 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • December 20, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 22, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 21, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 12, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • August 10, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 10, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 29, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 03, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • February 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • December 03, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 17, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 10, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 14, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 26, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 26, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 20, 2017: [Extend]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 31, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 31, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • March 31, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 16, 2017: [Furlough]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Request]
  • February 22, 2017: [Request]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.