U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Houston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 18, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 19, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Release from Custody]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • April 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • February 22, 2017: [Request]
  • February 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Request]
  • February 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.