U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chief Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 16, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • May 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 01, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 01, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 01, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2017: [Extend]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 25, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 24, 2017: [Witness List]
  • April 24, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 21, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 23, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 23, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 22, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2017: [Request]
  • February 22, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 17, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.