U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaPlante
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 04, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 07, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 07, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 24, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 09, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Request]
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2017: [Request]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 21, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.