U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bagola
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • March 11, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 22, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 18, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 15, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 10, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 10, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 23, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order]
  • April 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Request]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2017: [Request]
  • March 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Request]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Request]
  • February 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.