U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swalley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 08, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 19, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 12, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 20, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 08, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 07, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 06, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 28, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 28, 2017: [Furlough]
  • November 21, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 24, 2017: [Furlough]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 18, 2017: [Furlough]
  • October 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 18, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 19, 2017: [Consent]
  • June 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 10, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 09, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 09, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2017: [Request]
  • May 08, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Consent]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2017: [Request]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 03, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 03, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 03, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 03, 2017: [Request]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 03, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 02, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 27, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 16, 2017: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.