U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04020
  • Case Name: Anderson v. Depositors Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2017: [Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • March 29, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 06, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 15, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 15, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.