U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05070
  • Case Name: Christofferson v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Social Security Admin Hrg Transcript]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 10, 2018: [Objection]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 10, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 24, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 16, 2017: [Reverse]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.