U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chipps
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • April 29, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 28, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: [Consent]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 10, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 22, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 16, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 26, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 06, 2017: [Discovery]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 28, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Request]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 16, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.