U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30014-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Long et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
  • November 22, 2019: [Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 26, 2018: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 12, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 04, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 27, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 10, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 15, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 24, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 24, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 14, 2017: [Furlough]
  • July 12, 2017: [Furlough]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2017: [Consent]
  • June 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 30, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 18, 2017: [Revoke]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Request]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2017: [Request]
  • February 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2017: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 21, 2017: [Request]
  • February 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 17, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.