U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-03003
  • Case Name: Guthmiller v. Faulkton Healthcare Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 02, 2020: [Stipulation]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Status Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Letter Received]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 14, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 06, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 06, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 25, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Proposed Schedule]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 03, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • January 03, 2018: [Counterclaim]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Return of Service Executed]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Return of Service Executed]
  • September 08, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 08, 2017: [Third Party Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Leave to]
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 30, 2017: [Leave to]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Extend]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Discovery Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 31, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 06, 2017: [Return of Service Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 17, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 17, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.