U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40048
  • Case Name: Tylene Maxine Miller and Loren Dale Miller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
April, 2018
  • April 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of TFR (Used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (Without Notice)]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Proof of Claim]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Claim]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
January, 2018
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Claim]
May, 2017
  • May 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • May 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • May 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • May 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • May 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • April 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Late Notice]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • February 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • February 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • February 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.