U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:10-cv-05016
  • Case Name: Patton v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Transcript of Social Security Admin Hrg Received]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 01, 2018: [Withdraw]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Declaration]
  • September 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 24, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 20, 2018: [Objection]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 30, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.