U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05096
  • Case Name: Seay v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 13, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2018: [Extend]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 15, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Order re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 15, 2018: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 26, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 20, 2017: [Reverse]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Briefing Schedule]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Transcript of Social Security Admin Hrg Received]
  • February 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.